E
|
05/13/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/13/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
E
|
05/06/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#500
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2208
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#97
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#88
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 373
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 373
|
House
|
01/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|