E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/31/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5125
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2876
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3491
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#837
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Leibowitz
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
House
|
01/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|