Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1614
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#204
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 375
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 375
|
House
|
01/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|