Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3773 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#911 | Journal Page: 3773 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3773 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amended | 3-Burnam | Journal Page: 3772 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3772 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3655 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 2-Hughes | Journal Page: 3654 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3651 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 375 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 375 | |
House | 01/28/2009 | Filed |