Senate | 05/23/2009 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Rereferred to committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#913 | Journal Page: 3775 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3775 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3774 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3662 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3662 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3661 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#869 | Journal Page: 3661 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment tabled | 3-Lucio | Journal Page: 3661 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Thibaut | Journal Page: 3660 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 1-S. Miller | Journal Page: 3660 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order overruled | . | Journal Page: 3660 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3660 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 9:30 PM | Journal Page: 3651 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | . | Journal Page: 3651 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-S. Miller | Journal Page: 3651 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3651 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1123 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 375 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 375 | |
House | 01/28/2009 | Filed |