By: Martinez, Riddle (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 846 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009; May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the license or certificate renewal process for emergency medical services personnel and certain law enforcement officers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 773.0415 to read as follows: Sec. 773.0415. LIMITATION ON INFORMATION REQUIRED FOR CERTIFICATE RENEWAL. The requirements and procedures adopted by the department for the renewal of a certificate to practice as emergency medical services personnel issued under this chapter: (1) may not require an applicant to provide unchanged criminal history information already included in one or more of the applicant's previous applications for certification or for certificate renewal filed with the department; and (2) may require the applicant to provide only information relevant to the period occurring since the date of the applicant's last application for certification or for certificate renewal, as applicable, including information relevant to any new requirement applicable to the certificate held by the applicant. SECTION 2. Subchapter G, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 1701.317 to read as follows: Sec. 1701.317. LIMITATION ON INFORMATION REQUIRED FOR LICENSE RENEWAL. The requirements and procedures adopted by the commission for the renewal of a license issued under this chapter: (1) may not require an applicant to provide unchanged criminal history information already included in one or more of the applicant's previous applications for licensure or for license renewal filed with the commission; and (2) may require the applicant to provide only information relevant to the period occurring since the date of the applicant's last application for licensure or for license renewal, as applicable, including information relevant to any new requirement applicable to the license held by the applicant. SECTION 3. Sections 773.0415, Health and Safety Code, and 1701.317, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a license or certificate renewed on or after January 1, 2011. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *