1 | 1 | | 81R4837 CAS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Eissler H.B. No. 850 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to repeal on a periodic basis of the provisions of Titles 1 |
---|
8 | 8 | | and 2 of the Education Code to provide for legislative review of the |
---|
9 | 9 | | primary state statutes governing public education. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. (a) Effective September 1, 2011, Chapters 1, 4, |
---|
12 | 12 | | 5, 7, 8, 11, 13, and 30, Education Code, are repealed. |
---|
13 | 13 | | (b) Effective September 1, 2013, Chapters 34, 41, 42, 43, |
---|
14 | 14 | | 44, 45, and 46, Education Code, are repealed. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (c) Effective September 1, 2015, Chapters 12, 21, and 22, |
---|
16 | 16 | | Education Code, are repealed. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (d) Effective September 1, 2017, Chapters 18, 19, 25, 26, |
---|
18 | 18 | | 28, 29, 30A, 31, 32, 33, 37, and 38, Education Code, are repealed. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (e) Effective September 1, 2019, Chapter 39, Education |
---|
20 | 20 | | Code, is repealed. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. (a) The purpose of the repeal of chapters of the |
---|
22 | 22 | | Education Code by Section 1 of this Act is to provide the |
---|
23 | 23 | | legislature with the opportunity to carefully review each |
---|
24 | 24 | | provision of Titles 1 and 2, Education Code, in order to determine: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) which individual provisions should: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (A) be saved from repeal during the regular |
---|
27 | 27 | | legislative session before the date repeal is to take effect; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (B) remain unmodified as part of the code; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) which individual provisions should be saved from |
---|
30 | 30 | | repeal during the regular legislative session before the date |
---|
31 | 31 | | repeal is to take effect but should be amended to make the provision |
---|
32 | 32 | | or the public education system in this state more effective; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (3) which individual provisions should be repealed in |
---|
34 | 34 | | accordance with Section 1 of this Act. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) The Texas Education Agency and the Legislative Budget |
---|
36 | 36 | | Board shall assist the legislature in reviewing and shall make |
---|
37 | 37 | | recommendations to the legislature concerning the provisions of |
---|
38 | 38 | | Titles 1 and 2, Education Code. |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
40 | 40 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
41 | 41 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
42 | 42 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
43 | 43 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|