Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#368 | Journal Page: 1977 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1977 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1977 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1910 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1910 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 379 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 379 | |
House | 01/29/2009 | Filed |