E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4992 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4303 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#310 | Journal Page: 1846 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1828 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1812 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1812 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1124 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 379 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 379 | |
House | 01/29/2009 | Filed |