E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2623
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#151
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 379
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 379
|
House
|
01/29/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|