Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1879 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#424 | Journal Page: 2184 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2116 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2116 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 382 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 382 | |
House | 01/30/2009 | Filed |