House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 01/30/2009 | Filed |