Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB960 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Anchia, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 960
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing municipalities and counties access to
 criminal history record information for sexually oriented business
 license applicants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 411.122, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (b)  A municipality or county that requires a sexually
 oriented business to obtain a license or other permit under Section
 243.007, Local Government Code, is entitled to obtain from the
 department criminal history record information maintained by the
 department that relates to a person who:
 (1)  is an applicant for a license or other permit for a
 sexually oriented business issued by the municipality or county;
 (2)  is the holder of a license or other permit for a
 sexually oriented business issued by the municipality or county; or
 (3)  requests a determination of eligibility for a
 license or other permit for a sexually oriented business issued by
 the municipality or county.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *