Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/15/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2351
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2351
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#102
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 584
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 434
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 386
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 386
|
House
|
02/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|