Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB999 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Dutton, Edwards (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 999
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2009, rereferred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 26, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 26, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the closure of a school campus by the board of trustees
 of certain school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.174 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.174.  CAMPUS CLOSURE.  (a)  This section applies only
 to a school district with an enrollment of more than 155,000.
 (b)  Before ordering the closure of a school campus, the
 board of trustees of a school district shall hold a public hearing
 at which residents of the district may comment on the proposed
 closure.
 (c)  Not later than the 14th day before the date of the
 hearing, the board must:
 (1)  provide written notice of the hearing to the
 parent of or person standing in parental relation to each student
 affected by the closure; and
 (2)  publish notice of the hearing in a newspaper of
 general circulation in the district.
 (d)  The notice of the hearing required by Subsection (c)
 must include:
 (1)  the subject matter of the hearing, including the
 reason for the proposed closure; and
 (2) the location, date, and time of the hearing.
 (e)  Following a hearing under Subsection (b), the board
 shall vote on the proposed closure. If the board votes to close a
 school campus, the board shall send the results of the vote to the
 commissioner for approval.
 (f)  The board may not order the closure of a school campus
 without first obtaining the approval of the commissioner for the
 closure.  The commissioner shall approve or deny the board's
 request for approval under this subsection not later than the 30th
 day after the date the commissioner receives the request. If the
 commissioner fails to act within the time prescribed by this
 subsection, the request is considered approved.
 (g)  The board may not order the closure of a school campus
 for which a campus intervention team has been appointed under
 Section 39.1322(b) until:
 (1) the campus intervention team has:
 (A)  completed the comprehensive on-site
 evaluation required under Section 39.1323(a)(1) and the
 comprehensive on-site needs assessment under Section 39.1323(b);
 (B)  made recommendations as provided by Sections
 39.1323(a)(2) and (c); and
 (C)  assisted in the development of a school
 improvement plan for student achievement as required under Section
 39.1323(a)(3);
 (2)  the campus has received any financial or other
 assistance determined necessary under the evaluation process to
 implement the school improvement plan; and
 (3)  the campus has two complete school years during
 which to implement the school improvement plan.
 (h)  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *