E | 05/30/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6903 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4316 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3947 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2509 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 237 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#28 | Journal Page: 262 |
House | 02/12/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 02/09/2009 | Filed |