Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2106 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2682 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2682 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |