Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR117 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 117


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The State of Texas and the field of oceanography
 lost a renowned educator with the passing of Robert Osborne Reid of
 College Station on January 23, 2009, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Connecticut on August 24, 1921, Professor
 Reid moved with his family to Los Angeles in 1935; during the early
 years of the war, he participated in an army training program in
 meteorology at the Scripps Institution of Oceanography, and on
 completing the course in 1943, he was commissioned a second
 lieutenant in the Army Air Corps; posted to England as a weather
 officer, he worked on a team whose mission was to predict weather
 and tides for the Normandy Invasion; after the end of the war in
 Europe, he served in the Pacific Theater; and
 WHEREAS, Following his discharge from the military, Bob Reid
 finished his undergraduate degree in mechanical engineering at the
 University of Southern California and then, in 1946, he joined the
 first class admitted to a pioneering graduate oceanography program
 at Scripps; subsequently, he and his fellow alumni would play a
 significant role in developing other early oceanography programs
 around the world, based on the Scripps interdisciplinary approach;
 and
 WHEREAS, In 1951, Professor Reid was recruited to become a
 founding faculty member of the new graduate Department of
 Oceanography and Meteorology at Texas A&M University; over the
 ensuing years, he served as department chair, conducted important
 research in coastal oceanography and engineering, and helped to
 establish an ocean engineering program in the Department of Civil
 Engineering; in addition, he chaired or co-chaired the advisory
 committees of about 70 doctoral students and nearly 40 master's
 students; and
 WHEREAS, Professor Reid also lent his expertise to a host of
 extracurricular committees, organizations, and professional
 journals; among the many accolades conferred on this esteemed
 scientist and educator were awards for distinguished teaching and
 research, an honorary doctorate from Old Dominion University, and a
 medal from the University of Liege, Belgium; in 1983, his former
 students organized a symposium in his honor, and in 1987, Texas A&M
 named him distinguished professor emeritus; Professor Reid was a
 Fellow of the American Geophysical Union and American
 Meteorological Society and a member of the National Academy of
 Engineering and National Academy of Sciences; and
 WHEREAS, Bob Reid exchanged wedding vows with the former
 Marjorie Ferry in 1947, and the couple became the parents of three
 sons and three daughters; and
 WHEREAS, A kind and gentle man who considered himself a Texan
 by choice, Professor Reid made significant contributions to the
 advancement of 20th-century oceanography and brought great honor to
 Texas A&M University and to the Lone Star State; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Professor Robert Osborne Reid and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife
 of 62 years, Marjorie Ferry Reid; to his sons and daughter-in-law,
 Thomas Reid, Russell Reid, and Robert and Tina Reid; to his
 daughters, Nancy Reid and Carol McCormick; to his son-in-law,
 William V. Anderson; to his grandchildren, Kimberlee Spurlin,
 Wesley, Katherine, and Nicholas Paul Reid, Sarah Naomi McCormick,
 and Brandon, Nolan Daniel, and Ellie Lynn Anderson; to his
 great-grandchildren, Garrett Heitman, Aaden and Kason Anderson,
 and Kaely Brown; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Professor Robert Osborne Reid.
 Brown of Brazos
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 117 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 117 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 29, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor