E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5137 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2756 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2571 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#973 | Journal Page: 4053 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4053 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4053 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Filed |