Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR13 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R346 CME-F
22 By: Berman H.C.R. No. 13
33
44
55 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
66 WHEREAS, United States Border Patrol Agents Ignacio Ramos and
77 Jose Compean worked on the United States border with Mexico; and
88 WHEREAS, David Aguilar, the chief of the Office of Border
99 Patrol, testified before the United States Senate that "Border
1010 violence incidents are perpetrated against our agents on an all too
1111 frequent basis . . . from February 1, 2005, through June 30, 2007,
1212 there have been 1,982 incidents where border patrol agents have
1313 been assaulted. These assaults include rockings, physical
1414 assaults, vehicular assaults, as well as shootings and assaults
1515 with other weapons. . . . Border patrol agents have responded with
1616 the use of deadly force on 116 occasions, with 144 agents
1717 discharging their weapons during these 116 incidents"; and
1818 WHEREAS, This information would support the premise that
1919 border patrol agents operate in a climate of tension, danger, and
2020 even fear for the safety of themselves and others; and
2121 WHEREAS, On February 17, 2005, near Fabens, Texas, Agents
2222 Ramos and Compean, along with other border patrol agents, were
2323 involved in the pursuit of Osvaldo Aldrete-Davila, a Mexican
2424 national they suspected of smuggling drugs; and
2525 WHEREAS, After a high speed vehicle chase, Aldrete-Davila
2626 abandoned the van he was driving on the United States side of the
2727 border and fled on foot toward the border with Mexico; and
2828 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean also exited their
2929 respective vehicles and continued the pursuit on foot, with Agent
3030 Compean attempting to intercept Aldrete-Davila while Agent Ramos
3131 chased Aldrete-Davila directly; and
3232 WHEREAS, During the incident, both Agents Ramos and Compean
3333 discharged their weapons, and Agent Ramos testified later that he
3434 believed Aldrete-Davila had a gun in his hand, while Agent Compean
3535 testified that he saw something "shiny" in Aldrete-Davila's hand,
3636 but no weapon was recovered; and
3737 WHEREAS, According to forensic evidence, Aldrete-Davila was
3838 struck by a bullet from the gun of Agent Ramos, but both agents
3939 later testified that they did not realize at the time that he had
4040 been hit; and
4141 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila fled across the border into Mexico;
4242 the van driven by Aldrete-Davila was discovered by other border
4343 patrol agents to contain 743 pounds of marijuana, worth
4444 approximately $1 million; and
4545 WHEREAS, Following an investigation by the United States
4646 Department of Homeland Security's Inspector General and the office
4747 of the United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas,
4848 Agents Ramos and Compean were arrested approximately one month
4949 after the incident; and
5050 WHEREAS, Serious questions have been raised about the manner
5151 in which the office of United States Attorney Johnny Sutton
5252 prosecuted the agents, basing his cases largely on the testimony of
5353 Aldrete-Davila, testimony for which he was granted "limited use
5454 immunity" by United States Attorney Sutton's office; and
5555 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was not required to fully honor his
5656 immunity agreement and testify about his alleged involvement in
5757 drug trafficking after the events of February 17, 2005, and before
5858 the trial of Agents Ramos and Compean began; and
5959 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was arrested in the United States on
6060 November 15, 2007, and charged with conspiracy to possess marijuana
6161 between June 1, 2005, and November 30, 2005, and also charged with
6262 smuggling approximately 750 pounds of marijuana, worth over $1
6363 million, in October 2005, during the period he possessed "limited
6464 use immunity" for his testimony against Agents Ramos and Compean;
6565 and
6666 WHEREAS, Among other charges, Border Patrol Agents Ramos and
6767 Compean were charged by the United States Attorney's office under
6868 Section 924(c), Title 18, United States Code, with "Discharge of a
6969 firearm in commission of a crime of violence," which carries a
7070 10-year mandatory minimum sentence; and
7171 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean admitted that they did not
7272 fully adhere to border patrol policies with regard to reporting the
7373 incident, an error that usually would have led to a written
7474 reprimand, suspension, or dismissal; and
7575 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean were found guilty of
7676 violating Section 924(c), Title 18, United States Code, and
7777 received the 10-year mandatory minimum sentence; and
7878 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean were also convicted on
7979 other charges, so that their total sentences amounted to 11- and
8080 12-year terms, respectively; and
8181 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
8282 Commission, the average sentences in federal cases of sexual abuse
8383 averaged 8-1/3 years in 2006, the last year for which data is
8484 available; and
8585 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
8686 Commission, sentences in federal cases for manslaughter averaged
8787 just less than four years in 2006; and
8888 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
8989 Commission, the average sentences in federal cases of assault
9090 averaged just less than three years in 2006; and
9191 WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing
9292 Commission, sentences in federal cases involving firearms charges
9393 averaged three years in 2006; and
9494 WHEREAS, The sentences imposed on Agents Ramos and Compean
9595 are profoundly disproportionate based on the totality of
9696 circumstances and sentencing guidelines; and
9797 WHEREAS, These disproportionate sentences constitute a
9898 miscarriage of justice; and
9999 WHEREAS, Former Deputy Chief Luis Barker, who headed the
100100 border patrol office in the El Paso sector at the time of the
101101 incident, stated before the United States Senate that he agreed the
102102 penalty received by Agents Ramos and Compean was disproportionate;
103103 and
104104 WHEREAS, United States Attorney Sutton, referring to the
105105 sentences received by Agents Ramos and Compean, said, "Some say
106106 it's just too much time, and I have some sympathy for that"; and
107107 WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was reported in a press account to
108108 have stated that he thought the sentences were excessive; and
109109 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos's and Compean's motions to remain free
110110 on bond while they appeal their sentences were denied; and
111111 WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean have been imprisoned since
112112 January 17, 2007, awaiting appeal; and
113113 WHEREAS, Agent Ramos has been assaulted by other inmates in
114114 prison, and both men are at risk in prison given their law
115115 enforcement background; now, therefore, be it
116116 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
117117 hereby respectfully request that the president of the United States
118118 immediately commute the sentences of Agents Ramos and Compean to
119119 time served and grant a full pardon to both agents; and, be it
120120 further
121121 RESOLVED, That the Texas secretary of state forward an
122122 official copy of this resolution to the president of the United
123123 States of America.