E | 04/18/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1602 | |
E | 04/07/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1149 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 902 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1122 | |
House | 04/03/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 829 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 829 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 829 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 826 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1017 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 961 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Filed |