Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR140 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 140


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with many joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments may comfort the family and friends of
 Sarah Helen Stewart Coker of Paris, Texas, who passed away on March
 6, 2009, at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, Born on August 12, 1937, in Paris, the former Sarah
 Stewart was the daughter of Roy and Pearl Stewart and enjoyed the
 companionship of seven siblings, Katherine, Dan, Alford, Roy, Judy,
 Ruby, and Irene; she was a graduate of Paris High School; and
 WHEREAS, She married Roy Glenn Coker on October 15, 1955, at a
 ceremony held in her hometown, and together they shared a marriage
 that spanned half a century, until his passing in 2005; and
 WHEREAS, She was a valued congregant of Calvary United
 Methodist Church and will forever hold a treasured place in the
 hearts of all those who were fortunate enough to share in her love
 and friendship; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Sarah Helen Stewart Coker and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her sons
 and daughters-in-law, Roger and Vickie Coker, Steven and Kathy
 Coker, and Philip and Shari Coker; to her grandchildren, Phil
 Coker, Jr., and his wife, Desiree, Russell and Riley Coker, and Laci
 Coker and her special friend, Josh Bearl; to her great-grandchild,
 Beckham Allen Coker; to her brother and sisters, Roy Stewart, Jr.,
 Judy Stewart, Ruby Trotter, and Irene Stout; and to her other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn today, they do so in memory of
 Sarah Helen Stewart Coker.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 140 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 9, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 140 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor