E | 05/30/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6903 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4316 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3947 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 998 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1162 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1162 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 980 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Filed |