E | 05/13/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3680 | |
E | 05/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1902 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2158 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Printed in full | Journal Page: 1875 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1782 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2138 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1244 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1119 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Filed |