Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR157 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 157


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The passing of Charlie Summerlin of Mount Vernon on
 March 13, 2009, at the age of 63, has deeply saddened the family and
 friends of this esteemed Texan; and
 WHEREAS, Born on May 28, 1945, in Mount Pleasant to Henry and
 Imogene Temple Summerlin, Charlie Summerlin married the former
 Kathy Wooldridge, with whom he built a rich and rewarding life and
 had six children; and
 WHEREAS, Those who were fortunate to have known Charlie
 Summerlin will treasure their memories of time spent in his
 company, and he will long be missed by the many people whose lives
 he touched; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Charlie Summerlin and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his wife, Kathy
 Summerlin; to his children, Bennie Anglin and her husband, Don,
 Robert Summerlin and his wife, Stephanie, Lewis Summerlin and his
 wife, Lauryl, Gina Smith, Julie Summerlin, and Charlie Summerlin,
 Jr., and his wife, Crystal; to his 10 grandchildren and one
 great-grandchild; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Charlie Summerlin.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 157 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 16, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 157 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor