E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5123 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3185 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3185 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3185 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3185 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 2181 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2181 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1883 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2202 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2202 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2202 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 01/07/2009 | Filed |