E | 04/24/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1930 | |
E | 04/14/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1236 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 998 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1206 | |
House | 04/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1169 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 889 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1076 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1076 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Filed |