Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2128 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1265 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Filed |