E | 05/01/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2337 | |
E | 04/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1185 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1600 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1602 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1566 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1079 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1079 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 1079 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1078 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1078 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1240 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Filed |