E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6967 | |
House | 06/02/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6976 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6973 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 5128 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5128 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 5128 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 5126 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5126 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 4728 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 6007 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#1545 | Journal Page: 6007 |
House | 05/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6007 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 6006 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 1650 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Filed |