E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5980 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4137 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4137 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 4137 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4136 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1247 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1605 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1605 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Filed |