Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR195 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 195


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Robert
 Dale House of Johntown, who passed away on April 7, 2009, at the age
 of 74; and
 WHEREAS, Born on June 29, 1934, to Willie and Della Eudy House
 in the community of Cuthand, Robert House was a member of the
 Baptist faith who enjoyed the fellowship of many people; he also
 took pleasure in the outdoors and was an avid hunter and fisherman;
 and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his loved ones, Mr. House and his
 wife, Sharon, married in 1977, and they became the parents of six
 children, Carla, LeeAnn, Tonya, Keith, Jona, and Shane; with the
 passing years, they also had the pleasure of welcoming 12
 grandchildren and 3 great-grandchildren into the family; and
 WHEREAS, Robert House led a caring and purposeful life, and
 those fortunate enough to have shared in his love and friendship
 will long remember the many happy times they spent in his company;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Robert Dale House and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife, Sharon
 House; to his children, Carla Elliott and her husband, Dennis,
 LeeAnn Harlow and her husband, Jim, Tonya Hammond and her husband,
 Dick, Keith House and his wife, Robyn, Jona Posey and her husband,
 Randy, and Shane Compton and his wife, Terra; to his grandchildren,
 Keri Smale, Sara Elliott, Erin Seale, Molly McCuller, Jamie Harlow,
 Jared and Kasey Hammond, Rayn and Lane House, Meredith and Preston
 Posey, and Hunter Compton; to his great-grandchildren, Kadence
 Kennedy, Carlee Smale, and Colton Seale; to his sisters, Bess
 Ruthardt and Jettie Bond; to his sister-in-law, Berniece House; and
 to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Robert House.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 195 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 195 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor