Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR196 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 196


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Residents of Mount Pleasant lost a dedicated civic
 leader and a cherished friend with the passing of Judy Broach
 Hammonds on April 5, 2009, at the age of 60; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Mount Pleasant, the former Judy Broach
 was born on December 5, 1948, to Harrel and Mataline Anderson
 Broach; she went on to graduate from Mount Pleasant High School in
 1967, and she later embarked on a career as a teacher in public
 schools across the state; she also returned to her alma mater as an
 English, speech, and drama instructor; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Hammonds volunteered at Shelter Agencies for
 Families in East Texas and in 2006 joined the organization's staff
 as the financial director; the following year, she became a
 prevention educator and advocate; she regularly reached above and
 beyond the requirements of her position to assist her clients, and
 she was named the SAFE-T Employee of the Year for 2008; and
 WHEREAS, Active in a number of community service endeavors,
 Ms. Hammonds organized an elder health care coalition of
 representatives from nursing homes, home health agencies, and
 hospitals, through which she helped develop curricula and programs
 for senior citizens and hosted a monthly training for certified
 nursing assistants from area counties; this esteemed Texan also
 created a domestic violence response agency that she named Ounce of
 Prevention, and she was appointed chair of the Titus County
 Historical Commission; in addition, Ms. Hammonds was a member of
 the Mount Pleasant Housing Authority Board of Directors, Gladewater
 Baptist Church, and the local chapter of Daughters of the American
 Revolution; and
 WHEREAS, An unstoppable force when it came to helping others,
 Judy Hammonds was beloved for her enthusiasm, compassion, and
 can-do spirit; even in her illness, she continued to give back to
 her community, organizing events, setting agendas, and keeping
 others on track, and her generosity and many good works will long
 inspire all those who were fortunate enough to know her; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Judy Broach Hammonds and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband, Billy
 C. Hammonds; to her children, Matt Morris and his wife, Julia, and
 Amy Schmitt and her husband, Kenny; to her grandchildren, Bo and
 Leah Schmitt and Samantha Morris; to her brother, Micki Broach and
 his wife, Donna; to her niece, Sarah Broach; to her nephew, Josh
 Broach and his wife, Jaton; and to her other relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Judy Hammonds.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 196 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 196 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor