Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR200 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 200


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A generous and productive life drew to a close with
 the passing of Gratie Mae Potts of Clarksville on March 19, 2009, at
 the age of 88; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Berry and Effie Thompson, Gratie
 Potts was born in Clarksville on August 21, 1920; she graduated from
 Cheatham High School and went on to earn her bachelor's degree from
 Prairie View A&M University; after graduation, she married her
 college sweetheart, Frank Robinson, and the couple later became the
 parents of a treasured daughter, Janet; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Potts began her teaching career in Deport and
 then taught second grade at Central Elementary School and English
 at Central High School in New Boston, where she also coached the
 girls' basketball team to two district championships; in 1959, this
 esteemed educator returned to her alma mater and taught at Cheatham
 High until the end of segregation enabled her transfer to
 Clarksville High School; Mrs. Potts instilled in her students a
 love of learning and encouraged them to reach their full potential,
 earning their lasting respect and admiration; and
 WHEREAS, She married Willie D. Potts in 1957, and she was a
 devoted wife and mother to a family that grew to include four more
 daughters, Betty, Ester, Brenda, and Gloria, as well as three sons,
 Franklin, Samuel, and Willie Potts, Jr.; Mrs. Potts eventually
 welcomed 20 grandchildren, 23 great-grandchildren, and 5
 great-great-grandchildren into the family, and extended loving
 maternal care to her cousins, Patricia, Chelsey, Octavia, and
 Clayton Ricks, and most recently to Chelsey's daughter, De'Jah, and
 Octavia's son, Braden, in the next generation; and
 WHEREAS, Following her retirement in 1986, Mrs. Potts devoted
 herself to her community, continuing to teach others through her
 example of good works; she served as president of the Red River
 County chapter of the American Cancer Society and as a dynamic
 volunteer for the East Texas Medical Center Clarksville Auxiliary,
 Relay for Life, Helping Hands, the Retired Senior Volunteer
 Program, and the public library's thrift store; moreover, she was a
 member of PRIDE, the Retired Teachers Association, and Heroines of
 Jericho; a keen supporter of the democratic process, she attended
 meetings for political candidates and encouraged her fellow
 citizens to exercise their right to vote; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Potts joined Zion Traveler Baptist Church at an
 early age and went on to become a deaconess; she served the church
 in a variety of capacities, including program chair, mission
 teacher, announcement clerk, and funeral committee chair; in the
 late 1980s, she also became known as one of the "Golden Girls,"
 attending numerous church functions with her friends, Mildred
 Pearson, Lillie Williams, and Norma Williams, and acting as the
 charming group's chauffeur; moreover, she helped maintain longtime
 friendships as a member of the Cheatham High School Reunion
 Advisory Committee and never missed a reunion; and
 WHEREAS, Gratie Potts made a positive difference in countless
 lives through her commitment to education, to her community, and to
 her family, and she will long be remembered with the greatest
 affection by all who shared in the blessing of her love and
 friendship; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Gratie Mae Potts and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her daughters,
 Janet Porter, Ester Barber, Brenda Wilburn, and Gloria Barber; to
 her son, Samuel W. Potts; to her 20 grandchildren, 23
 great-grandchildren, and 5 great-great-grandchildren; to her
 cousins, Patricia, Chelsey and her daughter, De'Jah, Octavia and
 her son, Braden, and Clayton "C.J." Ricks; and to her many other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Gratie Mae Potts.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 200 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 200 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor