Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR201 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 201


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life came to an end with the
 death of Doris L. Joplin of Powderly on April 6, 2009, at the age of
 83; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Afton on May 10, 1925, the former Doris Haney
 was the daughter of Granville Lee and Maggie B. Mullins Haney; she
 became the wife of C. O. Joplin, and they enjoyed a long and
 rewarding marriage; the couple were the parents of four daughters,
 Patricia, Susan, Shirley, and Doris Elaine; with the passing years,
 Mrs. Joplin had the pleasure of welcoming 8 grandchildren, 11
 great-grandchildren, and 7 great-great-grandchildren into her
 family; and
 WHEREAS, Although Doris Joplin will be deeply missed, her
 friends and family may take comfort in their memories of the happy
 times they spent in her company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Doris L. Joplin and extend sincere
 sympathy to the members of her family: to her daughters, Patricia
 Christie, Susan Eckelt and her husband, Charles, and Shirley Alsup
 and her husband, Bernie; to her grandchildren, Tim Robbins, Rebecca
 Kedziora, Stephanie Loyd, Jennifer Hill, Tracey Olsen, Dale Alsup,
 Cathy Eckelt, and Charles Eckelt III; to her great-grandchildren
 and her great-great-grandchildren; to her siblings, Pearl Kovar and
 A. L. Haney; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Doris Joplin.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 201 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 201 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor