Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR206 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 206


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately express the deep sorrow felt
 at the loss of Christian Tyler Dunn-Donihoo of Mount Pleasant, who
 passed away on April 4, 2009, at the age of 17; and
 WHEREAS, Christian Donihoo was born on August 8, 1991, to
 Larry Donihoo and Tonya Dunn Woodruff; he went on to work as a
 carpenter, and he became a proud father to his son, Austin; and
 WHEREAS, Although this young Texan's life ended far too soon,
 memories of happy times spent in his company will forever be
 cherished by all those who were fortunate enough to share in his
 love and friendship; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Christian Tyler Dunn-Donihoo and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his son,
 Austin Dell Wofford; to his father, Larry Donihoo; to his mother,
 Tonya Woodruff; to his grandparents, Stephen and Myra Strawn, Betty
 Dunn, and Larry Donihoo; to his brothers, Dusty, Darby, and Diego
 Donihoo; to his sisters, Hailey Goodwin and Jaysa Stiver; to his
 stepbrother, Cody Carpenter; and to his other relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Christian Tyler Dunn-Donihoo.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 206 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 7, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 206 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 18, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor