Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR210 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 210


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Amarillo College lost an ardent champion with the
 passing of A.C. president Dr. Steven W. Jones on February 22, 2009,
 at the age of 56; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Shreveport, Louisiana, on September 28,
 1952, Dr. Jones worked as an industrial economist before turning
 his energies toward higher education; he held a bachelor's degree
 in business, an M.B.A. in management and economics, and a doctorate
 in higher education administration; he was also a graduate of the
 Harvard University Institute for Educational Management and the
 Center on Philanthropy at Indiana University; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Jones moved to Amarillo from Phillips Community
 College of the University of Arkansas, where he had served as
 chancellor since 1996; he was named president of Amarillo College
 on October 15, 2003, and over the ensuing years he charted an
 ambitious new course for this West Texas school; and
 WHEREAS, One of his first undertakings was the development of
 a long-range plan that focused on technology upgrades; he
 subsequently scored a major triumph with the passage in 2007 of a
 $68 million bond issue, by far the largest in school history;
 revenue from the bonds is slated to fund the renovation of existing
 classroom facilities and the construction of two new buildings, one
 to house math and science programs and the other a nursing and
 dental health center, which is being named in his honor; and
 WHEREAS, During his tenure, Dr. Jones worked to more closely
 align the school's technical programs with the needs of the
 community, so that local industry, business, and government would
 have a ready, well-qualified workforce and students could train in
 fields offering long-term employment prospects and high wages;
 innovative offerings drew new students and helped push the school's
 academic enrollment to more than 10,000; Dr. Jones also succeeded
 in increasing federal funding for the college by more than 35
 percent; and
 WHEREAS, A productive scholar, he published three books and
 dozens of articles in professional journals; moreover, numerous
 colleges, universities, and community college systems sought his
 expertise and counsel; earlier in his career, he served as vice
 chair of the American Association of Community Colleges Board of
 Directors, as a member of the board of the Ford Foundation Rural
 Community College Initiative, as a member of the President's
 Advisory Board of the Association of Community College Trustees,
 and as an adviser to the W. K. Kellogg Foundation for its community
 college program; and
 WHEREAS, In Amarillo, this esteemed gentleman chaired the
 boards of a regional medical center, a rural health care
 foundation, and the Amarillo Chamber of Commerce, and served as a
 board member of the Harrington Regional Medical Center, Amarillo
 Museum of Art, United Way of Amarillo & Canyon, Amarillo Symphony,
 and Salvation Army; he was a Paul Harris Fellow with Rotary
 International, as well as a Gideon and a deacon in the Baptist
 Church; and
 WHEREAS, In all his endeavors, Dr. Jones enjoyed the love and
 support of his wife, Tommye Lou Jones, and two daughters, Holly and
 Jennifer; and
 WHEREAS, Amarillo College has gained immeasurably from the
 leadership, experience, and unwavering commitment that Dr. Steven
 Jones brought to his post as president, and the legacy of his
 achievements will continue to enrich the citizens of the Panhandle
 for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Dr. Steven W. Jones and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife of 33
 years, Tommye Lou Jones; to his daughters, Holly Rhea Jones and
 Jennifer Ashley Jones; to his mother, Bobbie Jones; and to his other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Dr. Steven W. Jones.
 Smithee
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 210 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 11, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 210 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 13, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor