E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4642 | |
E | 05/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4079 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3947 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3298 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3179 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3179 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 3049 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2542 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Filed |