E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5208 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3682 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3682 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3682 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3682 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2757 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2570 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#953 | Journal Page: 3973 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 3973 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3972 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Amended | 1-Phillips and Burnam | Journal Page: 3972 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3971 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | Journal Page: 3969 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 01/26/2009 | Filed |