House | 05/31/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 6055 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/29/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 4766 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4065 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Filed |