E | 02/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 401 | |
E | 02/10/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 168 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 244 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 258 | |
House | 02/09/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 229 | |
Senate | 02/09/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 166 | |
Senate | 02/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 150 | |
House | 02/04/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 217 | |
House | 02/04/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 217 | |
House | 01/29/2009 | Filed |