Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR248 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 248


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Friends and family are mourning the loss of Mamie
 Bell Newsom of Paris, Texas, who passed away on May 4, 2009, at the
 age of 91; and
 WHEREAS, Mamie Newsom was born on August 29, 1917, to Pete
 Russell and Tillie Johnson in Oklahoma; she married S. J. Newsom,
 and the couple enjoyed 47 years together; they raised 3 children,
 Lillie, Faye, and Jimmy, and with the passing years, their family
 grew to include 12 grandchildren, 23 great-grandchildren, and 9
 great-great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Dedicated to her family and her church, Mrs. Newsom
 supported her husband in his work as a pastor, and the couple
 founded Northwest Baptist Church in Paris and served the
 congregation there for many years; and
 WHEREAS, Mamie Newsom led a life of devotion to her faith and
 her family, and all those who were fortunate enough to share in her
 love and friendship will forever cherish their memories of her
 kindness and generosity; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Mamie Bell Newsom and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her children,
 Lillie Dotson and her husband, Bill, Faye Huff, and Jimmy Newsom and
 his wife, Renee; to her grandchildren, great-grandchildren, and
 great-great-grandchildren; to her sister, Flora Fancher; to her
 brothers, Bill and Sonny Russell; and to her other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Mamie Newsom.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 248 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 248 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor