E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6896 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6975 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5981 | |
Senate | 05/29/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 4512 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 4127 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5172 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5172 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4809 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Filed |