Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR265 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 265


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately express the sorrow felt at
 the untimely death of Willie Gray Sapp of Paris, Texas, who passed
 away on May 17, 2009, at the age of 23; and
 WHEREAS, Born on January 2, 1986, to Danny and Suzi Broadus
 Sapp in Danbury, North Carolina, Willie Sapp was a loving brother
 and a treasured son and grandson; he worked as a bricklayer and was
 a member of Emberson Baptist Church; and
 WHEREAS, Although his time on this earth ended far too soon,
 Willie Sapp brought much joy into the lives of his loved ones, and
 he will forever be remembered with great tenderness and affection
 by all those who held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Willie Gray Sapp and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his father, Danny
 Sapp; to his mother, Suzi Broadus; to his brother, Jason Sapp; to
 his grandmother, Earlene Sapp; to his godparents, Gary and Carol
 McHone; to his aunts and uncles, Iris Gantt, Jackie Davis, Billy
 Gray and Tony Sapp, and Richard, Ray, and Bryant Broadus; to his
 great-aunt, Edna Booth; and to his other relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Willie Sapp.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 265 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 265 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor