Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR286 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Corte H.C.R. No. 286


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, House Bill No. 1831 has been adopted by the house of
 representatives and the senate and is being prepared for
 enrollment; and
 WHEREAS, The bill contains technical errors that should be
 corrected; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 the enrolling clerk of the house of representatives be instructed
 to correct House Bill No. 1831 as follows:
 (1) In SECTION 1.03a of the bill, in added Section
 418.016(b), Government Code (page 2a), strike "60 days" and
 substitute "30 days".
 (2) In SECTION 2.04 of the bill (page 27, line 25), strike
 "November 1, 2009" and substitute "June 1, 2010".
 (3) In SECTION 2.05 of the bill (page 29, line 1), strike
 "October 1, 2009" and substitute "January 1, 2010"