1 | 1 | | H.C.R. No. 286 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, House Bill No. 1831 has been adopted by the house of |
---|
6 | 6 | | representatives and the senate and is being prepared for |
---|
7 | 7 | | enrollment; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, The bill contains technical errors that should be |
---|
9 | 9 | | corrected; now, therefore, be it |
---|
10 | 10 | | RESOLVED by the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas, That |
---|
11 | 11 | | the enrolling clerk of the house of representatives be instructed |
---|
12 | 12 | | to correct House Bill No. 1831 as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) In SECTION 1.03a of the bill, in added Section |
---|
14 | 14 | | 418.016(b), Government Code (page 2a), strike "60 days" and |
---|
15 | 15 | | substitute "30 days". |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) In SECTION 2.04 of the bill (page 27, line 25), strike |
---|
17 | 17 | | "November 1, 2009" and substitute "June 1, 2010". |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) In SECTION 2.05 of the bill (page 29, line 1), strike |
---|
19 | 19 | | "October 1, 2009" and substitute "January 1, 2010" |
---|
20 | 20 | | Corte |
---|
21 | 21 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
22 | 22 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
23 | 23 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 286 was adopted by the House on June |
---|
24 | 24 | | 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
25 | 25 | | voting. |
---|
26 | 26 | | ______________________________ |
---|
27 | 27 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
28 | 28 | | I certify that H.C.R. No. 286 was adopted by the Senate on |
---|
29 | 29 | | June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
30 | 30 | | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | 31 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
32 | 32 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
33 | 33 | | Date |
---|
34 | 34 | | __________________ |
---|
35 | 35 | | Governor |
---|