1 | 1 | | 81R5785 MMS-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Berman H.C.R. No. 34 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | 6 | | WHEREAS, United States Border Patrol Agents Ignacio Ramos and |
---|
7 | 7 | | Jose Compean worked on the United States border with Mexico; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, David Aguilar, the chief of the Office of Border |
---|
9 | 9 | | Patrol, testified before the United States Senate that "Border |
---|
10 | 10 | | violence incidents are perpetrated against our agents on an all too |
---|
11 | 11 | | frequent basis . . . from February 1, 2005, through June 30, 2007, |
---|
12 | 12 | | there have been 1,982 incidents where border patrol agents have |
---|
13 | 13 | | been assaulted. These assaults include rockings, physical |
---|
14 | 14 | | assaults, vehicular assaults, as well as shootings and assaults |
---|
15 | 15 | | with other weapons. . . . Border patrol agents have responded with |
---|
16 | 16 | | the use of deadly force on 116 occasions, with 144 agents |
---|
17 | 17 | | discharging their weapons during these 116 incidents"; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | WHEREAS, This information would support the premise that |
---|
19 | 19 | | border patrol agents operate in a climate of tension, danger, and |
---|
20 | 20 | | even fear for the safety of themselves and others; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | WHEREAS, On February 17, 2005, near Fabens, Texas, Agents |
---|
22 | 22 | | Ramos and Compean, along with other border patrol agents, were |
---|
23 | 23 | | involved in the pursuit of Osvaldo Aldrete-Davila, a Mexican |
---|
24 | 24 | | national they suspected of smuggling drugs; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | WHEREAS, After a high speed vehicle chase, Aldrete-Davila |
---|
26 | 26 | | abandoned the van he was driving on the United States side of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | border and fled on foot toward the border with Mexico; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean also exited their |
---|
29 | 29 | | respective vehicles and continued the pursuit on foot, with Agent |
---|
30 | 30 | | Compean attempting to intercept Aldrete-Davila while Agent Ramos |
---|
31 | 31 | | chased Aldrete-Davila directly; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | WHEREAS, During the incident, both Agents Ramos and Compean |
---|
33 | 33 | | discharged their weapons, and Agent Ramos testified later that he |
---|
34 | 34 | | believed Aldrete-Davila had a gun in his hand, while Agent Compean |
---|
35 | 35 | | testified that he saw something "shiny" in Aldrete-Davila's hand, |
---|
36 | 36 | | but no weapon was recovered; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | WHEREAS, According to forensic evidence, Aldrete-Davila was |
---|
38 | 38 | | struck by a bullet from the gun of Agent Ramos, but both agents |
---|
39 | 39 | | later testified that they did not realize at the time that he had |
---|
40 | 40 | | been hit; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila fled across the border into Mexico; |
---|
42 | 42 | | the van driven by Aldrete-Davila was discovered by other border |
---|
43 | 43 | | patrol agents to contain 743 pounds of marijuana, worth |
---|
44 | 44 | | approximately $1 million; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | WHEREAS, Following an investigation by the United States |
---|
46 | 46 | | Department of Homeland Security's Inspector General and the office |
---|
47 | 47 | | of the United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas, |
---|
48 | 48 | | Agents Ramos and Compean were arrested approximately one month |
---|
49 | 49 | | after the incident; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | WHEREAS, Serious questions have been raised about the manner |
---|
51 | 51 | | in which the office of United States Attorney Johnny Sutton |
---|
52 | 52 | | prosecuted the agents, basing his cases largely on the testimony of |
---|
53 | 53 | | Aldrete-Davila, testimony for which he was granted "limited use |
---|
54 | 54 | | immunity" by United States Attorney Sutton's office; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was not required to fully honor his |
---|
56 | 56 | | immunity agreement and testify about his alleged involvement in |
---|
57 | 57 | | drug trafficking after the events of February 17, 2005, and before |
---|
58 | 58 | | the trial of Agents Ramos and Compean began; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was arrested in the United States on |
---|
60 | 60 | | November 15, 2007, and charged with conspiracy to possess marijuana |
---|
61 | 61 | | between June 1, 2005, and November 30, 2005, and also charged with |
---|
62 | 62 | | smuggling approximately 750 pounds of marijuana, worth over $1 |
---|
63 | 63 | | million, in October 2005, during the period he possessed "limited |
---|
64 | 64 | | use immunity" for his testimony against Agents Ramos and Compean; |
---|
65 | 65 | | and |
---|
66 | 66 | | WHEREAS, Among other charges, Border Patrol Agents Ramos and |
---|
67 | 67 | | Compean were charged by the United States Attorney's office under |
---|
68 | 68 | | Section 924(c), Title 18, United States Code, with "Discharge of a |
---|
69 | 69 | | firearm in commission of a crime of violence," which carries a |
---|
70 | 70 | | 10-year mandatory minimum sentence; and |
---|
71 | 71 | | WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean admitted that they did not |
---|
72 | 72 | | fully adhere to border patrol policies with regard to reporting the |
---|
73 | 73 | | incident, an error that usually would have led to a written |
---|
74 | 74 | | reprimand, suspension, or dismissal; and |
---|
75 | 75 | | WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean were found guilty of |
---|
76 | 76 | | violating Section 924(c), Title 18, United States Code, and |
---|
77 | 77 | | received the 10-year mandatory minimum sentence; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean were also convicted on |
---|
79 | 79 | | other charges, so that their total sentences amounted to 11- and |
---|
80 | 80 | | 12-year terms, respectively; and |
---|
81 | 81 | | WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing |
---|
82 | 82 | | Commission, the average sentences in federal cases of sexual abuse |
---|
83 | 83 | | averaged 8-1/3 years in 2006, the last year for which data is |
---|
84 | 84 | | available; and |
---|
85 | 85 | | WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing |
---|
86 | 86 | | Commission, sentences in federal cases for manslaughter averaged |
---|
87 | 87 | | just less than four years in 2006; and |
---|
88 | 88 | | WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing |
---|
89 | 89 | | Commission, the average sentences in federal cases of assault |
---|
90 | 90 | | averaged just less than three years in 2006; and |
---|
91 | 91 | | WHEREAS, According to the United States Sentencing |
---|
92 | 92 | | Commission, sentences in federal cases involving firearms charges |
---|
93 | 93 | | averaged three years in 2006; and |
---|
94 | 94 | | WHEREAS, The sentences imposed on Agents Ramos and Compean |
---|
95 | 95 | | are profoundly disproportionate based on the totality of |
---|
96 | 96 | | circumstances and sentencing guidelines; and |
---|
97 | 97 | | WHEREAS, These disproportionate sentences constitute a |
---|
98 | 98 | | miscarriage of justice; and |
---|
99 | 99 | | WHEREAS, Former Deputy Chief Luis Barker, who headed the |
---|
100 | 100 | | border patrol office in the El Paso sector at the time of the |
---|
101 | 101 | | incident, stated before the United States Senate that he agreed the |
---|
102 | 102 | | penalty received by Agents Ramos and Compean was disproportionate; |
---|
103 | 103 | | and |
---|
104 | 104 | | WHEREAS, United States Attorney Sutton, referring to the |
---|
105 | 105 | | sentences received by Agents Ramos and Compean, said, "Some say |
---|
106 | 106 | | it's just too much time, and I have some sympathy for that"; and |
---|
107 | 107 | | WHEREAS, Aldrete-Davila was reported in a press account to |
---|
108 | 108 | | have stated that he thought the sentences were excessive; and |
---|
109 | 109 | | WHEREAS, Agents Ramos's and Compean's motions to remain free |
---|
110 | 110 | | on bond while they appeal their sentences were denied; and |
---|
111 | 111 | | WHEREAS, Agents Ramos and Compean have been imprisoned since |
---|
112 | 112 | | January 17, 2007, and had their sentences commuted by the president |
---|
113 | 113 | | of the United States on January 19, 2009; now, therefore, be it |
---|
114 | 114 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
115 | 115 | | hereby respectfully request that the president of the United States |
---|
116 | 116 | | immediately grant a full pardon to both agents, with restoration of |
---|
117 | 117 | | pay and benefits; and, be it further |
---|
118 | 118 | | RESOLVED, That the Texas secretary of state forward an |
---|
119 | 119 | | official copy of this resolution to the president of the United |
---|
120 | 120 | | States of America. |
---|