E | 02/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 401 | |
E | 02/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 253 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 282 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 306 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 200 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 181 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 239 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 239 | |
House | 02/05/2009 | Filed |