E | 03/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 688 | |
E | 03/11/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 442 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 237 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 286 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 286 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Filed |