E | 03/06/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 614 | |
E | 02/23/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 416 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 290 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 365 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 401 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 340 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 273 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 248 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 288 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 288 | |
House | 02/16/2009 | Filed |